Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Paratransit in Maryland
Sponsored by
Senators Lewis Young and Charles
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Paratransit in Maryland; requiring the Task Force to study paratransit in the State, including current, needed, and expected funding for paratransit, reasons for current funding and spending gaps, and the role public-private partnerships could play in meeting funding and service gaps; and requiring the Task Force to report, on or before June 30, 2025, its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2024
Legislative Date
1/12/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Paratransit in Maryland
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/15/2024
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/12/2024 1/12/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Task Force to Study Paratransit in Maryland
Senate 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2024 2/07/2024 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2024 2/15/2024 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/14/2024 6:29 PM
Click to return on the top page