Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Personal Care Aides - Wage Reports
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring residential service agencies to submit certain reports to the Maryland Department of Labor regarding wage rates for personal care aides by September 1 each year, beginning in 2025; and requiring the Maryland Department of Health to report to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Health and Government Operations Committee by the 180th day after the release of the final federal Ensuring Access to Medicaid Services rule on an overview of the final rule and plans or steps that the Department will take to operationalize the rule.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
3/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {373821/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (34-12)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-33)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Provider Agencies and Personal Care Aides - Reimbursement and Wage Reports (Homecare Workers Livable Wage Act of 2024)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2024 3/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Favorable with Amendments {373821/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Personal Care Aides - Wage Reports
Senate 3/14/2024 2/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (34-12) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2024 3/04/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/25/2024 3/25/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing canceled
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (105-33) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 10:32 AM
Click to return on the top page