Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain county or municipality to convert its street lighting service to a customer-owned street lighting tariff, acquire certain street lighting equipment by purchase or condemnation, enter into an agreement to purchase electricity, and request that an electric company remove certain street lighting equipment in the county's or municipality's jurisdiction; authorizing certain street lighting disputes to be submitted to the Public Service Commission for resolution; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1083
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0835 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2022
Legislative Date
1/29/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - County and Municipal Street Lighting Investment Act
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Reassigned to Finance 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2022 1/29/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:54 PM
Click to return on the top page