Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Sponsored by
Senators West, Carozza, Watson, Klausmeier, Smith, and James
Status
In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup to study issues and factors potentially contributing to recruitment challenges and the decline in police officer retention statewide; and requiring the Workgroup to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 30, 2025.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0618
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0018 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2024
Legislative Date
1/17/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2024
Legislative Date
1/18/2024
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2024
Legislative Date
2/19/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {223124/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2024
Legislative Date
4/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {913824/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2024 1/17/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Senate 1/18/2024 1/18/2024 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2024 2/19/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Favorable with Amendments {223124/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Senate 2/22/2024 2/14/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2024 2/23/2024 Referred Appropriations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2024 4/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable with Amendments {913824/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Senate Concurs House Amendments 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/25/2024 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Police Recruitment and Retention Workgroup
Statutes
Last Updated: 4/10/2024 4:12 PM
Click to return on the top page