Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting an applicant for a specified Class B-D-7 license in a specified Old Goucher Revitalization District in the 43rd alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City from specified zoning requirements; creating exceptions under which the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City may issue specified new Class B-D-7 licenses in specified alcoholic beverages districts under specified circumstances; providing that a specified Class B-D-7 license may be transferred within the Old Goucher Revitalization District; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0832
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {123997/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {993722/1 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 04/07 (Delegate McCray) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Old Goucher Revitalization District
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Old Goucher Revitalization District
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Economic Matters 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {123997/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Floor Amendment {993722/1 (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Motion Special Order until 04/07 (Delegate McCray) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
(   12-102, 12-1407, 12-1603, 12-1605, 12-905 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page