Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Hershey, Benson, Klausmeier, Mathias, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Specifying the contents of a certain plan for retraining and placing certain displaced employees who work for a hospital that proposes to close, partially close, or convert to a certain freestanding medical facility; altering the purpose of a certain program the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation is required to establish to include certain employees; requiring the Department, before using the program established by the Act, to determine if there are other sufficiently funded programs in the Department to provide certain training; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0614
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0379 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737574/1
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
62AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737574/1
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {737574/1 Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-13)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable with Amendments {737574/1 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Senator Serafini) Adopted 62AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {737574/1 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Special Order until 4/9 (Senator Eckardt) Rejected 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {737574/1 Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Miller) Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (29-13) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 68 Click to view Recorded Media
(   19-120, 19-222, 19-326.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page