Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Out-of-State Health Care Practitioners - Provision of Behavioral Health Services via Telehealth - Authorization
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bailey, Carozza, Cassilly, Corderman, Eckardt, Edwards, Gallion, Griffith, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Ready, Salling, Simonaire, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a health care practitioner who is not licensed in the State to provide behavioral health services via telehealth to a patient in the State under certain circumstances; providing that an out-of-state health care practitioner who provides behavioral health services via telehealth to a patient located in the State will be held to the same standards of practice that are applicable to in-person health care settings in the State.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0421
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Out-of-State Health Care Practitioners - Provision of Behavioral Health Services via Telehealth - Authorization
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/18/2022 12:44 PM
Click to return on the top page