Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Administration – Outpatient Civil Commitment Pilot Program – Revisions
Sponsored by
Senators Augustine, Feldman, Beidle, and Hayes
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Behavioral Health Administration to allow an eligible individual to request enrollment into a certain outpatient civil commitment pilot program; requiring the Administration to allow an immediate family member of an eligible individual to request that the individual be voluntarily enrolled into a certain outpatient civil commitment pilot program; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0427
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2019
Legislative Date
2/05/2019
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {827075/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
4/04/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/31/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/30/2019
Legislative Date
4/30/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Behavioral Health Administration - Outpatient Civil Commitment - Statewide Expansion
Senate 2/05/2019 2/05/2019 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Favorable with Amendments {827075/1 Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2019 3/15/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Administration – Outpatient Civil Commitment Pilot Program – Revisions
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2019 4/04/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/04/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2019 3/31/2019 Returned Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/30/2019 4/30/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Text - Chapter - Behavioral Health Administration – Outpatient Civil Commitment Pilot Program – Revisions
(   7.5-205.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page