Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Parent of Stillborn Child
Sponsored by
Senator Elfreth
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Budget and Taxation (Senator Guzzone)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a parent of a stillborn child a refundable credit of $1,000 against the State income tax for each birth for which a certain certificate of birth resulting in stillbirth or a certificate of fetal death has been issued.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2022
Legislative Date
1/24/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Parent of Stillborn Child
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Reassigned to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663325/1
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2022 1/24/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Parent of Stillborn Child
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Reassigned to Budget and Taxation 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments {663325/1 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Committee Amendment Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2022 2/21/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Favorable with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
(   10-754 )
Last Updated: 3/8/2022 11:17 AM
Click to return on the top page