Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Lawn Care Pesticides - Child Care and School Facilities - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators King, Benson, Forehand, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Pugh, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting, with a specified exception, a person from applying a lawn care pesticide on the grounds of specified child care facilities and schools; authorizing a person to apply a lawn care pesticide on the grounds of specified child care facilities and schools if the Secretary of Agriculture determines that the emergency application is necessary to eliminate an immediate threat to human health; requiring a specified notice of an emergency application; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0433
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/07/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2013 3/07/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
(   5-201, 5-208.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM
Click to return on the top page