Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Board of Education - Membership and Election of Officers
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the number of members serving on the Baltimore County Board of Education; requiring the Baltimore County Executive to appoint a member of the county board from a certain list of nominees within a certain period of time; altering the processes of the Baltimore County School Board Nominating Commission to require the Commission to forward a list of nominees to an appointing official; and altering the quorum requirements for election of the chair and vice chair of the county board.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0150 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
2/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore County - Board of Education - Membership and Election of Officers
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 3/03/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Favorable Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2022 2/23/2022 Second Reading Passed 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Board of Education - Membership and Election of Officers
Senate 3/08/2022 2/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/03/2022 Referred Ways and Means 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2022 3/09/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/25/2022 3:25 PM
Click to return on the top page