Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Sponsored by
Senators M. Washington, Bailey, Benson, Corderman, Elfreth, Guzzone, Hettleman, Jackson, King, McCray, Rosapepe, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development to support certain eligible projects that improve the quality of life within and economic potential of Maryland communities by making targeted investments in crime prevention strategies to address certain concerns in certain areas; establishing the Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program Fund to provide financial assistance in the form of grants under the provisions of the Program for eligible projects; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0874 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2024
Legislative Date
1/19/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/08/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753625/1
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
Proceedings
22 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {753625/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/07/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2024
Legislative Date
2/16/2024
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2024
Legislative Date
3/21/2024
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/24/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-30)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2024 1/19/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/08/2024 2/08/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/09/2024 2/06/2024 Favorable with Amendments {753625/1 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/09/2024 2/06/2024 Motion Special Order until 2/12 (Senator Guzzone) Adopted 22 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2024 2/07/2024 Favorable with Amendments {753625/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2024 2/07/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Community Health and Safety Works Grant Program and Fund - Establishment
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/16/2024 2/16/2024 Referred Environment and Transportation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2024 3/21/2024 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/24/2024 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2024 3/29/2024 Third Reading Passed (102-30) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 3/27/2024 Returned Passed 72 Click to view Recorded Media
(   6-1201 through 6-1207 )
Last Updated: 4/16/2024 1:47 PM
Click to return on the top page