Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a vehicle used by a law enforcement agency from a prohibition against affixing specified tinting materials to a vehicle's windows.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0032
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2014 1/24/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
(   22-406 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page