Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations (Maryland Mandela Act)
Sponsored by
Senators M. Washington and Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring hearing officers and personnel involved with the supervision and care of individuals placed in restrictive housing to undergo certain training; establishing guidelines and procedures for the placement of incarcerated individuals in certain types of restrictive housing or disciplinary segregation; and requiring each correctional facility to create a monthly report containing certain information about individuals placed in restrictive housing and to publish the report on the facility's website.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0385
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023, January 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/03/2023
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2023 2/03/2023 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Correctional Services - Restrictive Housing - Limitations (Maryland Mandela Act)
Senate 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
(   9-614,   9-614.3, 9-614.4 )
Last Updated: 3/9/2023 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page