Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Funding Formulas – Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the appropriation in the annual budget for the purpose of providing grants to pay the capital costs of the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority to equal at least the amount appropriated in fiscal year 2026; requiring, subject to a certain contingency, that a certain mandated appropriation be increased by 3% each year starting in fiscal year 2028; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0438
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {693225/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Funding Formulas – Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Floor Committee Amendment {693225/1 Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority – Funding Formulas – Alteration (WMATA Dedicated Funding Amendment Act of 2022)
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Appropriations 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Hearing canceled
Last Updated: 3/29/2022 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page