Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Cannabis Administration – Cannabis Licensing – Protests of Renewal
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain individuals who are residents, commercial tenants who are not holders of or applicants for a license, or real estate owners, and who are located within 1,000 feet of the licensed premises to file a protest with the Maryland Cannabis Administration against the renewal of a cannabis license; providing that a protest against a license renewal may be filed with the Administration by at least 10 individuals; and establishing standards and requirements for the Administration's consideration of a protest filed under the Act.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1474
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2024
Legislative Date
3/11/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/27/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2024
Legislative Date
3/01/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Maryland Cannabis Administration – Cannabis Licensing – Protests of Renewal
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2024 3/11/2024 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Favorable Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2024 2/27/2024 Second Reading Passed 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Cannabis Administration – Cannabis Licensing – Protests of Renewal
Senate 3/14/2024 3/01/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2024 3/05/2024 Referred Economic Matters 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:48 PM
Click to return on the top page