Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Augustine, Beidle, Brooks, Carozza, Charles, Elfreth, Ferguson, Gile, Hester, Hettleman, James, Lam, McKay, Rosapepe, Salling, Waldstreicher, M. Washington, and West
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the Law Enforcement Cadet Apprenticeship Program in the Maryland Department of Labor to be the Public Safety Apprenticeship Program; expanding the purpose and scope of the Program to promote careers with certain public safety agencies; requiring the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to develop certain mental health wellness policies to be implemented in certain law enforcement agencies; establishing the Workgroup on Growing Engagement in the Law Enforcement Workforce; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0597
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2024
Legislative Date
1/22/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2024
Legislative Date
1/23/2024
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2024 1/22/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Growing Apprenticeships and the Public Safety Workforce (GAPS) Act
Senate 1/23/2024 1/23/2024 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/12/2024 12:00 PM
Click to return on the top page