Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each public senior higher education institution to be carbon neutral for certain emissions on or before January 1, 2025, and January 1, 2035; specifying certain requirements that a public senior higher education institution must meet to achieve the carbon neutral requirements under the Act; requiring each public senior higher education institution to designate, on or before August 1, 2022, a certain individual to implement and monitor the institution's progress with certain requirements; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0729
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0835 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Facilitating University Transformations by Unifying Reductions in Emissions (FUTURE) Act
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-101,   15-134, 18-101,   18-3901 )
Last Updated: 2/17/2022 2:02 PM
Click to return on the top page