Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Sponsored by
Senator Robinson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing a marketplace license in a specified alcoholic beverages district in Baltimore City; authorizing the Baltimore City Board of License Commissioners to issue the license; authorizing a license holder to obtain a refillable container permit under specified conditions; requiring the marketplace to have a minimum seating capacity of 75 individuals, a minimum capacity of 200 individuals, and a maximum capacity of 500 individuals; providing an annual license fee of $6,000; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0289
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {874831/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {874831/1 Adopted 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2017 3/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 40 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Referred Economic Matters 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Marketplace License
(   12-1001.1, 12-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page