Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Discharge Permits - Inspections and Administrative Continuations
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Guzzone, Elfreth, Lam, Patterson, Rosapepe, Washington, and Jackson
Status
In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing inspection and reporting requirements for certain permit holders; establishing administrative penalties for certain permit holders determined to be in significant noncompliance of certain State or federal water quality standards, effluent limitations, or other requirements; and requiring the Department of the Environment to clear a certain backlog of administratively continued permits on or before December 31, 2026.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0649
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2022
Legislative Date
1/27/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2022
Legislative Date
2/09/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {173726/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {553928/1 (Senator Jackson) Adopted
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2022 1/27/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - Discharge Permits - Inspections and Administrative Continuations
Senate 2/09/2022 2/09/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments {173726/1 Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Floor Amendment {553928/1 (Senator Jackson) Adopted 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Discharge Permits - Inspections and Administrative Continuations
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/29/2022 9:28 AM
Click to return on the top page