Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Claim Action Appeals From District Court - Nonattorney Representation
Sponsored by
Senator Norman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting specified representatives of specified entities from the requirement of admission to the Bar of Maryland and other requirements of the Court of Appeals for representing the entity in the appeals of specified civil actions originating in the District Court under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
39 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-2)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Small Claim Action Appeals From District Court - Nonattorney Representation
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Small Claim Action Appeals From District Court - Nonattorney Representation
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Judiciary 39 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-2) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 544
Text - Chapter - Small Claim Action Appeals From District Court - Nonattorney Representation
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page