Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Benson, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kelley, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Oaks, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of chlorpyrifos in the State.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0116
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824334/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824334/1
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2018
Legislative Date
2/27/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {824334/1
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554538/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {554538/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {803528/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {773728/1 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted (23-20)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {673527/1 (Senator Middleton)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {673527/1 (Senator Middleton) Withdrawn
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Motion Reconsider floor amendment (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {773728/1 (Senator Eckardt)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Pesticides - Use of Chlorpyrifos - Prohibition
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {824334/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {824334/1 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2018 2/27/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/1 (Senator Hershey) Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments {824334/1 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {554538/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2018 3/13/2018 Motion Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments {554538/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {803528/1 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {773728/1 (Senator Eckardt) Adopted (23-20) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Floor Amendment {673527/1 (Senator Middleton) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Floor Amendment {673527/1 (Senator Middleton) Withdrawn 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Motion Reconsider floor amendment (Senator Conway) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Floor Amendment {773728/1 (Senator Eckardt) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Conway) Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
(   5-210.6 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page