Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots – Placement of Signs – Regional Malls
Sponsored by
Senator Beidle
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the standards for signage at a regional mall parking lot by requiring that, before being authorized to tow or remove a vehicle, the owner or operator of the parking lot must place certain signs at each entrance to the parking lot.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2021
Legislative Date
1/20/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2021
Legislative Date
1/25/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2021 1/20/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots – Placement of Signs – Regional Malls
Senate 1/25/2021 1/25/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/5/2021 12:55 PM
Click to return on the top page