Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges - Veterans Advisors and Veterans Resource Centers - Established
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh, Astle, Bates, Cassilly, Currie, Eckardt, Hough, Klausmeier, Manno, Mathias, Peters, Salling, Simonaire, Smith, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each community college to employ a veterans advisor to provide comprehensive enrollment and advising services to current and prospective students who are veterans; and requiring each community college to establish a veterans resource center on the campus for certain purposes.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0689
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344235/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Community Colleges - Veterans Advisors and Veterans Resource Centers - Established
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {344235/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Community Colleges - Veterans Advisors and Veterans Resource Centers - Established
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Referred Ways and Means 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
(   16-109 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page