Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Sponsored by
Senator Washington
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing Baltimore City, without performing an engineering and traffic investigation, to decrease or raise to a previously established level the maximum speed limit on a highway under its jurisdiction; and prohibiting a local jurisdiction from using a monitoring system to enforce speed limits on any portion of a highway for which the speed limit has been decreased without performing an engineering and traffic investigation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0434
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {413422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/05/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-12)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Favorable with Amendments {413422/1 Adopted 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2022 3/05/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (124-12) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Returned Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 583
Text - Chapter - Motor Vehicles - Speed Limits - Establishment and Enforcement
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page