Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Personal Injury and Wrongful Death
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, Charles, Kelly, Muse, Rosapepe, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain limitations on noneconomic damages in civil actions for personal injury or wrongful death; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0083
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Personal Injury and Wrongful Death
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Last Updated: 2/19/2024 4:14 PM
Click to return on the top page