Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Personal Injury and Wrongful Death
Sponsored by
Senators Waldstreicher, Charles, Kelly, Muse, Rosapepe, and Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain limitations on noneconomic damages in civil actions for personal injury or wrongful death; and applying the Act only to causes of action arising after October 1, 2024.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0083
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2024
Legislative Date
1/24/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943425/1
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Corderman) Adopted
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {943425/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/05/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/06/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (27-18)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2024 1/24/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Personal Injury and Wrongful Death
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Hearing 2/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/18/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments {943425/1 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Motion Laid Over (Senator Corderman) Adopted 49AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments {943425/1 Adopted 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2024 3/05/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Personal Injury and Wrongful Death
Senate 3/18/2024 3/06/2024 Third Reading Passed (27-18) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Judiciary 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page