Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Prohibition on Transfer of Human Immunodeficiency Virus - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the prohibition on an individual from knowingly transferring or attempting to transfer the human immunodeficiency virus to another individual.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Health - Prohibition on Transfer of Human Immunodeficiency Virus - Repeal
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/26/2022 10:00 AM
Click to return on the top page