Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified business, when destroying a customer's records that contain specified personal or private information, to take specified steps to protect against unauthorized access to or use of the information; requiring a specified business that owns or licenses specified personal or private information of an individual residing in the State to implement and maintain specified security procedures and practices; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
(   14-3501 through 14-3504, 14-3505, 14-3506, 14-3507, 14-3508 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page