Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Sponsored by
Senator Sydnor
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that certain provisions of the Maryland Rules relating to discovery in civil matters apply in a certain administrative proceeding; requiring a court that receives a certain report to promptly notify counsel of record for the committed person; requiring the Maryland Department of Health to notify the court and certain persons if the Department receives a certain report; requiring a court to hold a hearing on request by any party after a certain application is made; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/06/2024
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {463921/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2024
Legislative Date
3/02/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-32)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/06/2024 2/06/2024 Hearing 2/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Favorable with Amendments {463921/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2024 3/02/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Committed Persons - Release Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2024 3/04/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/12/2024 Referred Judiciary 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2024 3/20/2024 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Favorable Adopted 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Second Reading Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/23/2024 Third Reading Passed (104-32) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Returned Passed 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/10/2024 4:12 PM
Click to return on the top page