Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Animal Testing and Research - Human-Relevant Research Funding and Animal Testing and Research Contributions
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Human-Relevant Research Fund under the administration of the Maryland Technology Development Corporation as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring that the interest earnings of the Fund be credited to the Fund; requiring the Corporation to establish a grant and loan program to provide grants and loans for State-funded, human-relevant animal testing alternatives research; and requiring certain research facilities who engage in animal testing or research to pay a certain contribution to the Secretary of Health.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0626
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2023
Legislative Date
2/10/2023
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2023
Legislative Date
2/13/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2023
Legislative Date
2/13/2023
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {723923/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-10)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations Ways and Means
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Animal Testing and Research - Human-Relevant Research Funding and Animal Testing and Research Licensure
Senate 2/10/2023 2/10/2023 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2023 2/13/2023 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/13/2023 2/13/2023 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2023 3/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Favorable with Amendments {723923/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Animal Testing and Research - Human-Relevant Research Funding and Animal Testing and Research Contributions
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Third Reading Passed (37-10) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations Ways and Means 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
(   10-401,   10-429,   10-4D-01 through 10-4D-06 )
(   24-2201 through 24-2205 )
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 4:59 PM
Click to return on the top page