Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley and Lee
Status
Veto sustained (0-44)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting specified individuals from serving as a health care agent under specified circumstances; establishing a specified exception; prohibiting specified individuals from making decisions about health care for specified individuals under specified circumstances; requiring a person who obtains specified information that would prohibit an individual from serving as a health care agent or making health care decisions for a specified individual to provide the information to a specified health care provider or facility; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0498
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {127679/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {606589/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2017
Legislative Date
5/26/2017
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/12/2018
Legislative Date
1/12/2018
Action
Veto sustained (0-44)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Reassigned to Finance 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {127679/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {606589/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Health Care Decisions Act - Advance Directives and Surrogate Decision Making - Disqualified Individuals
Post Passage 5/26/2017 5/26/2017 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/12/2018 1/12/2018 Veto sustained (0-44)
(   5-602, 5-605 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page