Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Actions to Repossess - Judgment for Tenants and Proof of Rental Licensure
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a landlord to submit to the clerk of the court evidence of compliance with certain local rental property licensure requirements and demonstrate that the landlord is compliant with the licensure requirements; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0703
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2022
Legislative Date
1/31/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {183826/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {713720/1 Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-45)
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2022 1/31/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Real Property - Actions to Repossess - Judgment for Tenants and Proof of Rental Licensure
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {183826/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Real Property - Actions to Repossess - Judgment for Tenants and Proof of Rental Licensure
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Referred Judiciary 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Floor Committee Amendment {713720/1 Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Lierman) Adopted 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (90-45) 51 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Senate Concurs House Amendments 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Real Property - Actions to Repossess - Judgment for Tenants and Proof of Rental Licensure
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Last Updated: 6/24/2022 1:15 PM
Click to return on the top page