Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth – Out–of–State Health Care Practitioners
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an out-of-state health care practitioner to provide telehealth services to a patient located in the State in accordance with certain provisions of the Act; requiring a certain health occupations board to register an out-of-state health care practitioner, under certain circumstances, to provide telehealth services to a patient located in the State; prohibiting an out-of-state health care practitioner who is registered under certain provisions of the Act from taking certain actions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0732
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/16/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Care Practitioners – Telehealth – Out–of–State Health Care Practitioners
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2021 3/16/2021 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
(   10-301, 1-1001, 1-1005, 11-301, 12-301, 13-301, 14-301, 15-301, 16-301, 17-301, 18-301, 19-301, 1A-301, 20-301, 2-301, 3-301, 4-301, 5-301, 6-301, 8-301, 9-301 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page