Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, from 55 years old to 50 years old, the age at which a resident is eligible for a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for retirement income attributable to employment as a correctional officer, law enforcement officer, or fire, rescue or emergency services personnel in the United State, the State or a political subdivision of the State; altering the amount of certain retirement income that may be included under a certain subtraction modification; applying the Act to certain taxable years; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0735
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0269 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2021
Legislative Date
1/26/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2021
Legislative Date
1/27/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2021 1/26/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
Senate 1/27/2021 1/27/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page