Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Corderman (By Request - Maryland Judicial Conference) and Senators Smith, West, McKay, Carter, Kelly, Charles, James, Folden, Muse, and Waldstreicher
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a certain protected individual or the Office of Information Privacy in the Administrative Office of the Courts to request that a governmental entity or person not publish personal information of the protected individual on the Internet, social media, or social networks or remove the information from any existing publication; specifying certain procedures for the protection of personal information of a protected individual; authorizing certain relief for a violation of the Act; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0664
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2024, October 1, 2024
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/03/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {403429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2024
Legislative Date
2/03/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/05/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2024 2/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2024 2/03/2024 Favorable with Amendments {403429/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/06/2024 2/03/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Court Personnel - Protection of Personal Information (Judge Andrew F. Wilkinson Judicial Security Act)
Senate 2/08/2024 2/05/2024 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/12/2024 2/12/2024 Referred Judiciary 24 Click to view Recorded Media
(   3-2301 through 3-2304, 3-2401 through 3-2407 )
Last Updated: 2/13/2024 4:42 PM
Click to return on the top page