Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program - Funding
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Bailey, Benson, Corderman, Elfreth, Hettleman, Jackson, Jennings, King, McCray, Rosapepe, Salling, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2025 and each fiscal year thereafter, to include at least $500,000 in the annual budget for the Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1472
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2024
Legislative Date
1/25/2024
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2024
Legislative Date
1/29/2024
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2024
Legislative Date
2/14/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {993821/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2024
Legislative Date
2/12/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2024
Legislative Date
2/21/2024
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2024
Legislative Date
3/19/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
4/03/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/20/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2024 1/25/2024 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program - Funding
Senate 1/29/2024 1/29/2024 Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2024 2/14/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Favorable with Amendments {993821/1 Adopted 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/15/2024 2/10/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Professional and Volunteer Firefighter Innovative Cancer Screening Technologies Program - Funding
Senate 2/20/2024 2/12/2024 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2024 2/21/2024 Referred Health and Government Operations 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2024 3/19/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 4/03/2024 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Favorable Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2024 3/20/2024 Second Reading Passed 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2024 3/20/2024 Returned Passed 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 10:32 AM
Click to return on the top page