Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights
Sponsored by
Senator Bailey
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain highway maintenance and service equipment and vehicles, while in use for snow removal or the protection of highway maintenance workers, to be equipped with and display green flashing lights simultaneously with yellow or amber flashing lights.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1150
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
51 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/10/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Favorable Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Second Reading Passed 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Equipment - Highway Maintenance and Service - Green Flashing Lights
Senate 3/15/2022 3/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Environment and Transportation 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/08/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 51 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:13 PM
Click to return on the top page