Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Community Colleges – Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program
Sponsored by
Senators King, Ferguson, Guzzone, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Pinsky, Robinson, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to consult with the Maryland Association of Community Colleges when establishing a certain review process and adopting certain guidelines or regulations for a grant program for supplemental services and supports for students with disabilities in community colleges; and requiring, beginning in fiscal year 2020, that the Governor include in the annual budget bill a General Fund appropriation of at least $250,000 to the Commission to be used to award grants under the program.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1388
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894334/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48CClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means Appropriations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Community Colleges – Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments {894334/1 Adopted 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Community Colleges – Supplemental Services and Supports for Students With Disabilities Grant Program
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48CClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means Appropriations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
(   16-319 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page