Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Sponsored by
Senators Guzzone, Elfreth, Griffith, Jackson, King, McCray, Rosapepe, Young, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing employers that claim the federal work opportunity credit to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain wages paid to individuals with barriers to employment; altering the calculation of a certain subtraction modification for certain salary and wages paid to certain individuals; requiring the Department of Legislative Services to prepare a tax credit evaluation of the credit on or before December 31, 2028; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021, but before January 1, 2029; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0002
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {133929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/28/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {133929/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2022 3/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Senate 3/29/2022 3/16/2022 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/21/2022 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2022 3/30/2022 Rereferred to Ways and Means
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/30/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/24/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Returned Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/01/2022 4/01/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 5
Text - Chapter - Income Tax – Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Last Updated: 7/27/2022 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page