Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Automated Expungement, Waiting Periods, and Adverse Actions (Clean Slate Act of 2024)
Sponsored by
Senators McKay, Muse, Sydnor, Smith, Kelly, Waldstreicher, West, and Carter
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions of law relating to waiting periods for the filing of certain petitions for expungement to authorize the filing of a petition a certain amount of time after the completion of the sentence; establishing procedures for the automated expungement of certain clean slate eligible charges; requiring the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to submit a report semiannually detailing the progress and outcomes of the automated expungement process during the preceding 6 months; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0658
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024, January 1, 2027
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2024
Legislative Date
1/26/2024
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2024
Legislative Date
1/31/2024
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2024 1/26/2024 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Automated Expungement, Waiting Periods, and Adverse Actions (Clean Slate Act of 2024)
Senate 1/31/2024 1/31/2024 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 1:53 PM
Click to return on the top page