Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Labor and Employment - Exemptions From Overtime Pay - Administrative, Executive, or Professional Capacity
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Kagan, Manno, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the conditions under which an individual who works in a specified administrative, executive, or professional capacity qualifies for an exemption from overtime pay; requiring that individuals be compensated on a salary basis at a specified rate or amount to qualify as an individual who is employed in an administrative, executive, or professional capacity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0665
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Labor and Employment - Exemptions From Overtime Pay - Administrative, Executive, or Professional Capacity
Senate 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   3-403, 3-403.1, 3-410, 3-415 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page