Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Sponsored by
Senator Jackson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a certain provision of law authorizing a member of the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission to designate a certain representative to act at a certain meeting to the same effect as if the member were personally present to require that the designation be made in writing; providing that the Secretary of State Police is the chair of the Commission; altering and reorganizing provisions of law relating to the powers and duties of the Commission; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {488773/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2021
Legislative Date
3/23/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {488773/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety – Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2021 3/11/2021 Referred Judiciary 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/23/2021 3/23/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 6:18 PM
Click to return on the top page