Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 505
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the salary of the Sheriff of Carroll County from $110,000 to $125,000 beginning December 6, 2022, and to $140,000 beginning December 5, 2023, and thereafter; and providing that the Act does not apply to the salary of the incumbent Sheriff.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0794
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2021
Legislative Date
2/15/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/24/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
4/02/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/13/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 505
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/15/2021 2/15/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Favorable Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2021 2/24/2021 Second Reading Passed 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Senate 3/16/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Referred Environment and Transportation 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 4/02/2021 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2021 3/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2021 3/13/2021 Returned Passed 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 505
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:18 PM
Click to return on the top page