Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Sales in Grocery Stores and Supermarkets - Referendum
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to issue a Class A beer and light wine license to a grocery store, chain store, supermarket, or discount house; and submitting the Act to a referendum of the qualified voters of Baltimore City at the general election to be held in November 2022.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Contingency - on a referendum
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2022
Legislative Date
2/10/2022
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Baltimore City - Alcoholic Beverages - Sales in Grocery Stores and Supermarkets - Referendum
Senate 2/10/2022 2/10/2022 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2022 3/15/2022 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 3:01 PM
Click to return on the top page