Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Supermarket License
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Dorchester County to issue a Class A beer license or a Class A beer and wine license to a specified supermarket under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Supermarket License
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Dorchester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Supermarket License
Senate 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   19-102, 19-1501, 19-1504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page