Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment
Sponsored by
Senators Corderman, Carozza, Edwards, Hershey, Klausmeier, Salling, and Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing an individual to claim a credit against the State income tax for certain travel, hospitality, and entertainment expenses paid or incurred in the State by the individual during taxable years 2022 and 2023 under certain circumstances; providing that the credit may not be allowed for certain travel expenses for which the individual claimed a certain federal deduction; requiring the Department of Commerce, on application by an individual, to issue a tax credit certificate in a certain amount; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1273
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0730 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2022
Legislative Date
2/02/2022
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2022
Legislative Date
2/03/2022
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2022
Legislative Date
2/11/2022
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2022 2/02/2022 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment
Senate 2/03/2022 2/03/2022 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/11/2022 2/11/2022 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-754 )
Last Updated: 3/30/2022 11:37 AM
Click to return on the top page