Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain definition of regulated firearm to include a certain unfinished frame or receiver; authorizing a person to continue to possess a certain firearm or unfinished frame or receiver on or after January 1, 2022, if the firearm or unfinished frame or receiver is marked with a unique serial number and the person maintains a certain record log; prohibiting a person from possessing a certain firearm or unfinished frame or receiver on or after January 1, 2022; providing certain penalties; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0638
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021, January 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Senate 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/18/2021 5:19 PM
Click to return on the top page