Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Members - Appointment
Sponsored by
Senators Lam and Salling
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the members of the Health Services Cost Review Commission be appointed with the advice and consent of the Senate of Maryland.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2023
Legislative Date
2/06/2023
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Services Cost Review Commission - Members - Appointment
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/15/2023
Action
Rereferred to Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/14/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/08/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Services Cost Review Commission - Members - Appointment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/10/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2023
Legislative Date
3/22/2023
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2023 2/06/2023 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Services Cost Review Commission - Members - Appointment
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/14/2023 2/15/2023 Rereferred to Executive Nominations
Senate 3/14/2023 3/14/2023 Favorable Report by Executive Nominations
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/08/2023 Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Services Cost Review Commission - Members - Appointment
Senate 3/17/2023 3/10/2023 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Health and Government Operations 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2023 3/22/2023 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/28/2023 6:29 PM
Click to return on the top page