Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Adult High School Pilot Program - Funding and Grants
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Adult High School Pilot Program to provide grants to certain approved pilots; requiring the Governor to include a federal fund or general fund appropriation of $250,000 in the fiscal year 2022 budget to the Program and a federal fund or general fund appropriation of $250,000 in the fiscal year 2023 budget for certain pilots; and requiring the Program to use certain funds to provide a $250,000 grant in fiscal year 2022 to a certain pilot.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2021
Legislative Date
1/29/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Adult High School Pilot Program - Funding and Grants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {869633/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/18/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Adult High School Pilot Program - Funding and Grants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/19/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
20 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/22/2021
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/26/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/27/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-10)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Adult High School Pilot Program - Funding and Grants
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2021 1/29/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Education - Adult High School Pilot Program - Funding and Grants
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments {869633/1 Adopted 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2021 2/18/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education - Adult High School Pilot Program - Funding and Grants
Senate 3/04/2021 2/19/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2021 3/01/2021 Referred Appropriations 20 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/20/2021 3/20/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/22/2021 3/22/2021 Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/10/2021 3/26/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/27/2021 Third Reading Passed (127-10) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/24/2021 Returned Passed 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Text - Chapter - Education - Adult High School Pilot Program - Funding and Grants
Age
(   9.7-101, 9.7-107 )
Last Updated: 7/26/2021 6:56 AM
Click to return on the top page